Assembly | 09/03/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 156, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 09/03/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/25/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2153.) | ||
Senate | 07/16/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/13/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/09/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2319.) | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 2). | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2015 | Introduced. To print. |