California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR85 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 10, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 3, 2015

Amended

Bill July 9, 2015
Bill June 25, 2015