Assembly
|
09/21/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 187, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/21/2015
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2478.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2470.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2015
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|