BILL NUMBER: ACR 89CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 187 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 21, 2015 ADOPTED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 3, 2015 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 17, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 29, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Wilk (Principal coauthor: Senator Runner) JUNE 18, 2015 Relative to the Connie Worden-Roberts Memorial Bridge. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 89, Wilk. Connie Worden-Roberts Memorial Bridge. This measure would designate the Golden Valley Road Bridge over State Highway Route 14 in the City of Santa Clarita as the Connie Worden-Roberts Memorial Bridge. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost for appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, Connie Worden-Roberts demonstrated extraordinary service to the Santa Clarita Valley community and was known as the Santa Clarita Valley's "Road Warrior"; and WHEREAS, Connie Worden-Roberts championed the development of the valley's transportation network for nearly four decades, serving as the vice-chair of the City of Santa Clarita Formation Committee and serving on the city's first planning commission; and WHEREAS, Connie Worden-Roberts also served as chairwoman of the League of Women Voters of Los Angeles County, founder of the Valley Industry Association, former chairwoman of the board and director of the Santa Clarita Valley Chamber of Commerce, and as a member of many more community organizations; and WHEREAS, Connie Worden-Roberts was an early visionary and tireless advocate for the Golden Valley Road Bridge project, knowing it was necessary to meet the needs of the growing valley; and WHEREAS, Connie Worden-Roberts passed away on August 12, 2014; and WHEREAS, Designating the Golden Valley Road Bridge over State Highway Route 14 in the City of Santa Clarita as the Connie Worden-Roberts Memorial Bridge would be an appropriate honor for this community champion; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the Golden Valley Road Bridge over State Highway Route 14 in the City of Santa Clarita as the Connie Worden-Roberts Memorial Bridge; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of erecting appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.