Assembly | 09/03/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 157, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 09/03/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/25/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2154.) | ||
Senate | 08/17/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/14/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/13/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2357.) | ||
Assembly | 07/09/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 9). | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2015 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2015 | Introduced. To print. |