California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR90 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/03/2015

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 90CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 157 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 3, 2015 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 24, 2015 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 13, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 13, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Irwin (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Alejo, Travis Allen, Atkins, Baker, Bigelow, Bloom, Bonilla, Brough, Brown, Calderon, Campos, Chang, Chau, Chvez, Chiu, Chu, Cooley, Dababneh, Dahle, Daly, Dodd, Eggman, Frazier, Beth Gaines, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gatto, Gipson, Gomez, Gonzalez, Gordon, Gray, Hadley, Roger Hernndez, Holden, Jones, Jones-Sawyer, Kim, Lackey, Levine, Linder, Lopez, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Nazarian, Obernolte, O'Donnell, Olsen, Patterson, Perea, Quirk, Rendon, Ridley-Thomas, Rodriguez, Salas, Steinorth, Mark Stone, Thurmond, Ting, Waldron, Weber, Wilk, Williams, and Wood) JUNE 18, 2015 Relative to California Firefighters Memorial Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 90, Irwin. California Firefighters Memorial Day. This measure would proclaim October 17, 2015, as Firefighters Memorial Day. WHEREAS, The California Firefighters Memorial, located on the grounds of the State Capitol, serves to honor and commemorate California firefighters who unwaveringly serve our great state with pride, courage, and honor; and WHEREAS, The California Firefighters Memorial is also a symbol of gratitude and appreciation to the men and women of the fire service who put their lives on the line each day to protect the people, property, and beauty of California; and WHEREAS, Each of the over 1,250 names engraved on the brushed limestone walls of the California Firefighters Memorial is a tribute to the finest and bravest of our state who have made the ultimate sacrifice as firefighters; and WHEREAS, The California Firefighters Memorial is the only state monument capturing the names of these courageous firefighters, who made service to our great State of California their priority, and shall continue this legacy in perpetuity; and WHEREAS, Many of the fallen firefighters whose names adorn the California Firefighters Memorial suffered and ultimately succumbed to diseases, such as cancer, as a result of the hazardous nature of their work, including routine exposure to toxic chemicals; and WHEREAS, On October 17, 2015, firefighters and their families from throughout the state will gather in Sacramento with their fellow Californians for the 2015 California Firefighters Memorial Ceremony to honor the men and women of the fire service who have selflessly given their lives to protect California; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims October 17, 2015, as Firefighters Memorial Day, and urges Californians to remember firefighters who have fallen in the line of duty and to express their appreciation to those firefighters who continue to protect us; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.