Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 09/01/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2016 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6515.) | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2016 | Amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 08/29/2016 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 29). | ||
Assembly | 08/18/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 08/17/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2015 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2015 | Introduced. To print. |