California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR91 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 08/30/2016

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 91AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 30, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 17, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Alejo JUNE 19, 2015 Relative to memorial highways. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 91, as amended, Alejo. Memorial highways. This measure would designate  the overpass on San Juan Road over State Highway 101 in the City of Aromas and the County of San Benito as The Red Barn Overpass. The measure would also designate  specified portions of State Route 183 and State Highway 101 in the County of Monterey as the Chief Warrant Officer 2 Edward Balli Memorial Highway, the Specialist Ricardo Cerros, Jr. Memorial Highway, and the Sgt. Javier Sanchez Memorial Highway. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing  each of  these special designations and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. Fiscal committee: yes.  WHEREAS, The Big Red Barn located off State Highway 101 in Aromas, California, was built by Kaiser Aluminum for the Ellingwood Hay Company in 1945 during World War II; and   WHEREAS, People from all over the world have traveled to the Big Red Barn for its famous Disneyana and antiques, building its reputation as a historical landmark; and   WHEREAS, For over 40 years, the Big Red Barn has served as the site for the Big Red Barn Flea Market, one of the largest regular gatherings in the region encompassing the Counties of San Benito and Monterey; and   WHEREAS, The flea market is host to many different small vendors and individuals who travel from all over the region to sell all kinds of products and local specialties; and   WHEREAS, During these Sunday gatherings, sellers and shoppers from many different ethnic backgrounds seek to do commerce harmoniously with one another; and   WHEREAS, This piece of history is a symbol of diversity and has become renowned for its significance in the local community and its importance in bringing people and cultures from all walks of life together; and  WHEREAS, United States Army Chief Warrant Officer 2 Edward Balli from Salinas, California, was killed in action in Afghanistan on January 20, 2014, and received two Bronze Stars for his service in Iraq and Afghanistan; and WHEREAS, United States Army Specialist Ricardo Cerros, Jr. from Salinas, California, was killed in action in Afghanistan on October 8, 2011, and received the Purple Heart; and WHEREAS, United States Army Sgt. Javier Sanchez from Greenfield, California, was killed in action in Afghanistan on June 23, 2013; now, therefore, be it Resolved, by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the  overpass on San Juan Road that passes over State Highway 101 near the Big Red Barn in the City of Aromas and the County of San Benito as The Red Barn Overpass;   portion of State Route 183   from Davis Road to Espinosa Road in the City of Salinas in the County of Monterey as the Chief Warrant Officer 2 Edward Balli Memorial Highway;  and be it further  Resolved, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Route 183 in the City of Salinas from Davis Road to Espinosa Road in the County of Monterey as the Chief Warrant Officer 2 Edward Balli Memorial Highway; and be it further  Resolved, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway 101 from John Street in the City of Salinas to Exit 317 in Chualar in the County of Monterey as the Specialist Ricardo Cerros, Jr. Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway 101  from Arroyo Seco Road to Teague Avenue  in the City of Soledad in the County of Monterey  from Arroyo Seco Road to Teague Avenue   as  the Sgt. Javier Sanchez Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing  each of  these special designations, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources  covering that cost,   sufficient to cover the cost of the signs for which the donations were made,  to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.