Assembly | 09/21/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 188, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 09/21/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/02/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/02/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2391.) | ||
Senate | 08/26/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/24/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2526.) | ||
Assembly | 07/13/2015 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2357.) | ||
Assembly | 07/07/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 7). | ||
Assembly | 07/06/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Measure version as amended on July 2 corrected. | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2015 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2015 | Introduced. To print. |