California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR92 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2015

Amended

Bill August 20, 2015
Bill July 13, 2015
Bill July 2, 2015