California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AJR17 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 22, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 10, 2015

Amended

Bill July 9, 2015
Bill June 25, 2015