LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AJR17
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AJR17
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AJR17
Compare Versions
AJR17 Chaptered September 10, 2015
AJR17 Enrolled September 2, 2015
AJR17 Amended July 9, 2015
AJR17 Amended June 25, 2015
AJR17 Introduced May 22, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AJR17 Chaptered September 10, 2015
AJR17 Enrolled September 2, 2015
AJR17 Amended July 9, 2015
AJR17 Amended June 25, 2015
AJR17 Introduced May 22, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare