Assembly
|
08/25/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2015
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2015
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2111.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2230.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
Amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|