California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AJR18 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2015

Chaptered

Bill August 25, 2015

Amended

Bill July 2, 2015
Bill June 25, 2015
Bill June 16, 2015