California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AJR2 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill April 22, 2015

Chaptered

Bill April 27, 2015

Amended

Bill April 14, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015