LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AJR2
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AJR2
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AJR2
Compare Versions
AJR2 Chaptered April 27, 2015
AJR2 Enrolled April 22, 2015
AJR2 Amended April 14, 2015
AJR2 Amended March 26, 2015
AJR2 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AJR2 Chaptered April 27, 2015
AJR2 Enrolled April 22, 2015
AJR2 Amended April 14, 2015
AJR2 Amended March 26, 2015
AJR2 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare