Assembly | 09/07/2016 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 177, Statutes of 2016. | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2016 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2016 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2016 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 2. Page 5521.) | ||
Senate | 08/29/2016 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/26/2016 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/25/2016 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 1. Page 6267.) | ||
Assembly | 08/23/2016 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/22/2016 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 18). | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2016 | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2016 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2016 | Introduced. To print. |