LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AJR46
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AJR46
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AJR46
Compare Versions
AJR46 Chaptered September 7, 2016
AJR46 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AJR46 Amended August 25, 2016
AJR46 Amended August 23, 2016
AJR46 Introduced June 23, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AJR46 Chaptered September 7, 2016
AJR46 Enrolled August 31, 2016
AJR46 Amended August 25, 2016
AJR46 Amended August 23, 2016
AJR46 Introduced June 23, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare