Assembly | 06/02/2015 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 53, Statutes of 2015. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2015 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1122.) | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2015 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1345.) | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2015 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 5). | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2015 | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2015 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2015 | Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2015 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2015 | Introduced. To print. |