California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AJR8 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2015

Chaptered

Bill June 2, 2015

Amended

Bill May 7, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015