LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AR5
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AR5
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AR5
Action History
Assembly
07/09/2015
Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2317.)
Assembly
06/23/2015
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 23).
Assembly
05/07/2015
Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
Assembly
05/06/2015
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Amended.
Assembly
05/04/2015
Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
Assembly
01/08/2015
Introduced.