California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AR5 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 07/09/2015

 BILL NUMBER: HR 5AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JULY 9, 2015 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 6, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Cristina Garcia  (   Coauthors:   Assembly Members   Achadjian,   Alejo,   Atkins,   Baker,   Bigelow,   Bloom,   Bonilla,   Bonta,   Brough,   Brown,   Burke,   Calderon,   Campos,   Chang,   Chau,   Chvez,   Chiu,  Chu,   Cooley,   Cooper,   Dababneh,   Dahle,   Daly,   Dodd,   Eggman,   Frazier,   Beth Gaines,   Gallagher,   Eduardo Garcia,   Gatto,   Gipson,   Gomez,   Gonzalez,   Gordon,   Hadley,   Roger Hernndez,   Holden,   Irwin,   Jones,   Jones-Sawyer,   Kim,   Levine,   Linder,   Lopez,   Low,   Maienschein,   Mathis,   Mayes,   McCarty,   Medina,   Melendez,   Mullin,   Nazarian,   Obernolte,   O'Donnell,   Olsen,   Quirk,   Rendon,   Rodriguez,   Salas,   Steinorth,   Mark Stone,   Thurmond,   Ting,   Wagner,   Weber,   Wilk,   Williams,   and Wood   )  JANUARY 8, 2015 Relative to Mexico and human rights. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST HOUSE OR SENATE RESOLUTIONS DO NOT CONTAIN A DIGEST WHEREAS, On September 26, 2014, 43 college students from the Ayotzinapa Normal School in Guerrero, Mexico, disappeared in Iguala, Mexico; and WHEREAS, Mexico's Attorney General, Jsus Murillo Karam, announced in a televised press conference on November 7, 2014, that the evidence indicates the 43 missing students had been executed and incinerated in the municipal dump of Cocula, Mexico, by the Guerreros Unidos cartel at the behest of corrupt officials; and WHEREAS, It has been estimated that 25,000 to 26,000 people have disappeared in Mexico since 2006; and WHEREAS, The disappeared often include the very vulnerable, such as poor migrants, indigenous people, and women and children; and WHEREAS, The director of the American division of Human Rights Watch, Jos Manuel Vivanco, described the murders in Iguala, Mexico, and an earlier massacre in Tlatlaya, Mexico, as "the worst atrocities we've seen in Mexico in years, but they are hardly isolated incidents"; and WHEREAS, There has been an international outcry regarding the deaths of the missing students in Mexico from, among others, the United Nations, the Parliament of the United Kingdom, the European Parliament, and the international human rights community; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, That the Assembly adds its voice to those in the international community condemning the disappearance and deaths of the missing college students from Mexico as a violation of human rights, of which the government of Mexico has yet to even acknowledge, and offers its support to all those in Mexico standing up for human rights and justice against corruption and violence; and be it further Resolved, That the Assembly urges the government of Mexico to support further dialogue between the international community, including the United States, and human rights organizations on human rights reforms; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.