|
09/24/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 598, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5427.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6081.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
June 29 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4148.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4002.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
May 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2016
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
May 16 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2016
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3392.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2016
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2016
|
March 29 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|