California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1028 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016