Senate | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2016 | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2016 | Set for hearing May 27. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2016 | Set for hearing May 2. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3612.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2016 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2016 | April 12 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2016 | Set for hearing April 12. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2016 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2016 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |