California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1031 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 04/06/2016

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1031AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 6, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hancock FEBRUARY 12, 2016 An act to  add Section 6027.5 to, and amend and repeal Section 13010.5 of,   amend Section 13010.5 of  the Penal Code, relating to criminal statistics, and making an appropriation therefor. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1031, as amended, Hancock. Juvenile justice information system. Existing law requires the Department of Justice to collect information regarding the juvenile justice system. Existing law requires the department to annually present to the Governor a report containing the criminal statistics of the preceding year.  Existing law establishes the Board of State and Community Corrections to collect and maintain available information and data about state and community correctional policies, practices, capacities, and needs.  This bill would require the  Board of State and Community Corrections,   Department of Justice,  on or before July 1, 2019, to establish a Juvenile Justice Information System to develop and maintain statewide statistical information, as specified.  The bill would additionally, on January 1, 2020, remove the require that the Department of Justice collect information regarding the juvenile justice system.  The bill would appropriate an unspecified sum from the General Fund to the  Board of State and Community Corrections   department  for the purpose of funding the development of a design structure and implementation plan for the  California  Juvenile Justice Information System. Vote: 2/3. Appropriation: yes. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 6027.5 is added to the Penal Code, to read: 6027.5. (a) On or before January 1, 2018, the Board of State and Community Corrections shall develop, with advice from the Chief Probation Officers of California and other stakeholders consistent with the provisions of subdivision (c) of Section 6024, a design structure and implementation plan for the California Juvenile Justice Information System. (b) On or before July 1, 2019, the Board of State and Community Corrections shall establish and implement a California Juvenile Justice Information System consistent with this act. (c) The purpose of the California Juvenile Justice Information System shall be to develop and maintain statewide statistical information, including information collected and shared by counties, which promotes the operational and program effectiveness of state and local juvenile justice systems in California in reducing the incidence of juvenile crime and recidivism among juvenile offenders. The information system to be developed by the Board of State and Community Corrections shall include, but not be limited to, the following features: (1) Providing for the integrated and user-friendly collection and reporting of statewide juvenile justice data reflecting key demographic and case processing characteristics of children who come into contact with the juvenile justice system. (2) Providing data relating to the effectiveness of programs, practices, or other prevention and intervention strategies employed to respond to juvenile crime and reduce recidivism among juvenile offenders. (3) Facilitate and support the scope and quality of data describing the characteristics and needs of youthful offenders and the juvenile justice programs and practices necessary to effectively manage state and local resources invested in the juvenile justice system. (4) Support local juvenile justice agencies in developing and maintaining local juvenile justice data systems and in the collection and submission of local juvenile justice data to state agencies. (d) In establishing the technology infrastructure for the development of the California Juvenile Justice Information System, the board shall adopt a set of goals and objectives consistent with this section, to be reflected in a system design which shall support the direction for the information system.   SEC. 2.   SECTION 1.  Section 13010.5 of the Penal Code is amended to read: 13010.5. (a) The department shall collect data pertaining to the juvenile justice system for criminal history and statistical purposes. This information shall serve to assist the department in complying with the reporting requirement of subdivisions (c) and (d) of Section 13012, measuring the extent of juvenile delinquency, determining the need for and effectiveness of relevant legislation, and identifying long-term trends in juvenile delinquency. Any data collected pursuant to this section may include criminal history information which may be used by the department to comply with the requirements of Section 602.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code.  (b) The department shall assist the Board of State and Community Corrections, at the request and direction of the board, in the development of the California Juvenile Justice Information System, established by Section 6027.5, in transitioning data collected pursuant to this section.   (c) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2020, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2020, deletes or extends that date.   (b) On or before January 1, 2018, the department shall develop, with advice from the Chief Probation Officers of California, the Judicial Council, advocates for juveniles, and other stakeholders, a design structure and implementation plan for the California Juvenile Justice Information System.   (c) On or before July 1, 2019, the department shall establish and implement a California Juvenile Justice Information System consistent with this section.   (d) The purpose of the California Juvenile Justice Information System shall be to develop and maintain statewide statistical information, including information collected and shared by counties, which promotes the operational and program effectiveness of state and local juvenile justice systems in California in reducing the incidence of juvenile crime and recidivism among juvenile offenders. The information system to be developed by the department shall include, but not be limited to, the following features:   (1) Providing for the integrated and user-friendly collection and reporting of statewide juvenile justice data reflecting key demographic and case processing characteristics of children who come into contact with the juvenile justice system.   (2) Providing data relating to the effectiveness of programs, practices, or other prevention and intervention strategies employed to respond to juvenile crime and reduce recidivism among juvenile offenders.   (3) Facilitating and supporting the scope and quality of data describing the characteristics and needs of youthful offenders and the juvenile justice programs and practices necessary to effectively manage state and local resources invested in the juvenile justice system.   (4) Supporting local juvenile justice agencies in developing and maintaining local juvenile justice data systems and in the collection and submission of local juvenile justice data to state agencies.   (e) In establishing the technology infrastructure for the development of the California Juvenile Justice Information System, the department shall adopt a set of goals and objectives consistent with this section, to be reflected in a system design which shall support the direction for the information system.   SEC. 3.   SEC. 2.  The sum of ____ dollars ($____) is hereby appropriated from the General Fund to the  Board of State and Community Corrections   Department of Justice  for the purpose of funding the development of a design structure and implementation plan for the California Juvenile Justice Information System.