Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
June 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4111.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2016
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3593.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
March 29 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2016
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|