California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1049 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2016

Amended

Bill August 3, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill April 11, 2016