|
09/21/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 427, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5360.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 9. Page 5880.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
June 13 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3926.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3766.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3616.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|