California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1051 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill August 4, 2016
Bill June 29, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016
Bill May 10, 2016
Bill April 6, 2016