California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1059 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill June 21, 2016
Bill April 18, 2016