LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1059
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1059
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1059
Compare Versions
SB1059 Chaptered September 21, 2016
SB1059 Enrolled August 29, 2016
SB1059 Amended June 21, 2016
SB1059 Amended April 18, 2016
SB1059 Introduced February 16, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1059 Chaptered September 21, 2016
SB1059 Enrolled August 29, 2016
SB1059 Amended June 21, 2016
SB1059 Amended April 18, 2016
SB1059 Introduced February 16, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare