|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 719, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5908.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 4098.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4002.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3519.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|