California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1060 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 22, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 19, 2016