|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 720, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 2. Page 5527.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 6366.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5954.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (August 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 3. Page 3872.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3616.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 3616.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Set for hearing April 20 in GOV. & F. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|