LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1069
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1069
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1069
Compare Versions
SB1069 Chaptered September 27, 2016
SB1069 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB1069 Amended August 25, 2016
SB1069 Amended August 19, 2016
SB1069 Amended August 1, 2016
SB1069 Amended June 16, 2016
SB1069 Amended April 26, 2016
SB1069 Amended April 13, 2016
SB1069 Amended April 6, 2016
SB1069 Introduced February 16, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1069 Chaptered September 27, 2016
SB1069 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB1069 Amended August 25, 2016
SB1069 Amended August 19, 2016
SB1069 Amended August 1, 2016
SB1069 Amended June 16, 2016
SB1069 Amended April 26, 2016
SB1069 Amended April 13, 2016
SB1069 Amended April 6, 2016
SB1069 Introduced February 16, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare