California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB11 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2015

Amended

Bill August 28, 2015
Bill July 8, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015
Bill March 23, 2015
Bill February 26, 2015