LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB11
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB11
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB11
Compare Versions
SB11 Chaptered October 3, 2015
SB11 Enrolled September 3, 2015
SB11 Amended August 28, 2015
SB11 Amended July 8, 2015
SB11 Amended June 1, 2015
SB11 Amended April 15, 2015
SB11 Amended March 23, 2015
SB11 Amended February 26, 2015
SB11 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB11 Chaptered October 3, 2015
SB11 Enrolled September 3, 2015
SB11 Amended August 28, 2015
SB11 Amended July 8, 2015
SB11 Amended June 1, 2015
SB11 Amended April 15, 2015
SB11 Amended March 23, 2015
SB11 Amended February 26, 2015
SB11 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare