|
08/25/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 196, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4864.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5719.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3846.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3493.) (April 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|