California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1138 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 25, 2016

Amended

Bill June 22, 2016
Bill April 18, 2016