BILL NUMBER: SB 1138ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 11, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 4, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 22, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 18, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hueso FEBRUARY 18, 2016 An act to add Section 6726 to the Government Code, relating to Space Day. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1138, Hueso. Space Day. Existing law requires the Governor to proclaim certain days each year for specified reasons. Existing law also designates particular days each year as having special significance in public schools and educational institutions, and encourages those entities to conduct suitable commemorative exercises on those dates. This bill would require the Governor to proclaim the first Friday in May of each year to be Space Day, and designate that date as having special significance in public schools and educational institutions. The bill would require the Governor to encourage public schools and educational institutions to conduct suitable commemorative exercises on that date. The bill would additionally require the Governor to direct the Department of General Services to turn off nonessential lights on the State Capitol Building on Space Day, as specified, to encourage every resident, business, and public entity to dim or turn off their lights between 9 p.m. and 10 p.m. on Space Day. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 6726 is added to the Government Code, to read: 6726. (a) The Governor shall proclaim the first Friday in May of each year to be Space Day and designate that date as having special significance in public schools and educational institutions. The Governor shall encourage public schools and educational institutions to conduct suitable commemorative exercises on that date. (b) The Governor shall encourage every resident, business, and public entity to dim or turn off their lights between 9 p.m. and 10 p.m. on Space Day. (c) Space Day shall promote space observation and appreciation, promote California's aerospace industry, and encourage students to pursue careers in science, technology, engineering, and mathematics. (d) The Governor shall direct the Department of General Services to turn off the nonessential lights on the State Capitol Building between 9:00 p.m. and 10:00 p.m. on Space Day as a symbolic act designed to encourage all California citizens, businesses, and other entities to voluntarily dim or turn off their lights on Space Day.