|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 786, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 5531.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 5893.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 4044.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4004.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3559.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2016
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|