California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1139 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill April 19, 2016
Bill April 4, 2016