|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 6. Page 5489.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 20. Page 6226.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 4104.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4004.) (May 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
April 25 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3522.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|