California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1157 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 6, 2016