Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6477.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on INS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 4045.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4004.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2016
|
Set for hearing May 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2016
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3520.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2016
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|