California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1160 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2016

Amended

Bill August 29, 2016
Bill August 18, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016
Bill April 6, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016