California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1165 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 29, 2016

Amended

Bill June 21, 2016
Bill May 17, 2016
Bill March 29, 2016