LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1165
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1165
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1165
Compare Versions
SB1165 Chaptered August 29, 2016
SB1165 Enrolled August 12, 2016
SB1165 Amended June 21, 2016
SB1165 Amended May 17, 2016
SB1165 Amended March 29, 2016
SB1165 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
SB1165 Chaptered August 29, 2016
SB1165 Enrolled August 12, 2016
SB1165 Amended June 21, 2016
SB1165 Amended May 17, 2016
SB1165 Amended March 29, 2016
SB1165 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare