California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1169 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2016

Amended

Bill June 30, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 7, 2016